Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1443 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14849 Week
» 67865 Month
» 187392 Year
» 3214245 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3549 |
26/09/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08434 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/09/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3549 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
31/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
12/04/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08434 |
|
|
10/02/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08434 from Derby (DY) |
|
|
30/03/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|