Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1490 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14896 Week
» 67912 Month
» 187439 Year
» 3214292 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D355 |
16/08/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40155 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3101/D651 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
16/08/1961 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
22/01/1985 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys |
Cut Up |
01/1988 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
Information |
Surplusto requirements |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
16/08/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
02/09/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/08/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
02/09/1971 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/08/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D355 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3101 Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
14/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
02/09/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40155 |
|
|
18/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
22/01/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40155 |
|
|
01/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|