Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 2301 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15707 Week
» 68723 Month
» 188250 Year
» 3215103 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3550 |
03/10/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08435 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/10/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/10/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3550 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
28/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
07/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
21/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
26/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08435 |
|
|
11/07/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (BG) |
|
|
30/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08435 from Hull Botanic Gardens (BG) |
|
|
21/05/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|