Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 457 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6211 Week
» 34169 Month
» 68811 Year
» 1290376 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3550 03/10/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08435 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 03/10/1958
Withdrawn 30/11/1980 off Hull Botanic Gardens (BG)
Time in Service 22 yrs, 1 mth , 27 dys
Cut Up 21/05/1983
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill (New) 03/10/1958
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 01/07/1961
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 30/09/1967
62B Dundee West 4w/e 28/06/1969
64B Haymarket 5w/e 07/08/1971
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 2w/e 21/08/1971
36A Doncaster w/e 26/02/1972
BG Hull Botanic Gardens w/e 11/07/1976
   Withdrawn 30/11/1980


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/10/1958 To Service To service as D3550
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
   
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
28/08/1968 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: In Works - Works shunter RO 11/1968 Link
28/06/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee West (62B)    
07/08/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
21/08/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
26/02/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08435    
11/07/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (BG)    
30/11/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 08435 from Hull Botanic Gardens (BG)    
21/05/1983 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev