Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3551 03/10/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08436 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 03/10/1958
Withdrawn 10/01/1992 off Doncaster (DR)
Time in Service 33 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill (New) 03/10/1958
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 01/07/1961
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 30/09/1967
60A Inverness 5w/e 01/03/1969
36A Doncaster w/e 26/02/1972
40B Immingham w/e 06/05/1972
   Withdrawn 10/01/1992

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/10/1958 To Service To service as D3551
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
   
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
28/08/1968 Sightings Aberdeen: Around the area - On Ferryhill shed RO 11/1968 Link
28/08/1968 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: In Works - Works shunter RO 11/1968 Link
01/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
15/07/1969 Sightings Inverness shed and environs: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
26/02/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
06/05/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08436    
10/01/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 08436 from Doncaster (DR)    

prev prev