Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 615 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 8954 Week
» 6062 Month
» 113008 Year
» 1334573 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3552 10/10/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08437 10/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 10/10/1958
Withdrawn 01/12/1984 off Motherwell (ML)
Time in Service 26 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys
Cut Up 31/12/1985
Cut At J R Adams (Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 10/10/1958
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 30/09/1967
66C Hamilton (West) 5w/e 31/01/1970
   Withdrawn 01/12/1984


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/10/1958 To Service To service as D3552
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
14/07/1967 Sightings Aberdeen shed and environs: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
31/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
10/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08437    
01/12/1984 Withdrawn Condemned as 08437 from Motherwell (ML)    
31/12/1985 Scrapped Broken up by J R Adams: Glasgow    

prev prev