Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5905 Week
» 33863 Month
» 68505 Year
» 1290070 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3553 17/10/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08438 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 17/10/1958
Withdrawn 23/03/1986 off March (MR)
Time in Service 27 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 30/10/1992
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 17/10/1958
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 30/09/1967
31B March w/e 26/02/1972
   Withdrawn 23/03/1986


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/10/1958 To Service To service as D3553
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
14/07/1967 Sightings At Craiginches RO 9/1969  
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
28/08/1968 Sightings Aberdeen: Around the area - In vicinity of the station RO 11/1968 Link
26/02/1972 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08438    
23/03/1986 Withdrawn Condemned as 08438 from March (MR)    
30/10/1992 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev