Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 197 Today
» 1354 Yesterday
» 4443 Week
» 1551 Month
» 108497 Year
» 1330062 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3554 24/10/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08439 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 24/10/1958
Withdrawn 17/10/1988 off Immingham (IM)
Time in Service 29 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys
Cut Up 30/09/1994
Cut At Gwent Demolition (Margam)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
64F Bathgate (New) 24/10/1958
64B Haymarket 5w/e 24/09/1966
64H Leith Central 4w/e 25/11/1967
65A Eastfield 5w/e 30/12/1967
66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 27/01/1968
66A Polmadie 3w/e 29/06/1968
62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 31/08/1968
36A Doncaster w/e 14/06/1969
40B Immingham w/e 01/05/1971
   Withdrawn 17/10/1988


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/10/1958 To Service To service as D3554
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Bathgate (64F)
   
24/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
25/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
30/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
27/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
29/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
31/08/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
14/06/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
01/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08439    
17/10/1988 Withdrawn Condemned as 08439 from Immingham (IM)    
30/09/1994 Scrapped Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam    

prev prev