Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 26 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6241 Week
» 17946 Month
» 349435 Year
» 426022 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3559 07/11/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08444 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 07/11/1958
Withdrawn 02/11/1986 off Cardiff Canton (CF)
Time in Service 27 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
64E Polmont (New) 07/11/1958
65F Grangemouth 4w/e 25/01/1964
64B Haymarket 5w/e 01/03/1969
36A Doncaster w/e 14/06/1969
   Withdrawn 02/11/1986

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
07/11/1958 To Service To service as D3559
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Polmont (64E)
   
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
01/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
14/06/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08444    
02/11/1986 Withdrawn Condemned as 08444 from Cardiff Canton (CF)    

prev prev