Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17805 Week
» 70821 Month
» 190348 Year
» 3217201 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3566 |
05/12/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08451 |
06/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1972 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/12/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
09/1972 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/12/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3566 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
14/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
10/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
09/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08451 |
|
|