Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2727 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16133 Week
» 69149 Month
» 188676 Year
» 3215529 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3571 |
03/01/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08456 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/01/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/01/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3571 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08456 |
|
|
29/04/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08456 from Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
30/06/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|