Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 801 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14844 Week
» 79798 Month
» 282462 Year
» 3309315 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3574 |
m/e |
08/1895 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1895 |
WOS |
|
Worcester |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/12/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
WOS |
Worcester |
m/e |
31/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1910 |
Diagram R2/3 boiler fitted |
02/1916 |
Diagram BR4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
04/1923 |
Diagram R2/3 boiler fitted |
04/1927 |
Diagram BR4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1947 |
Worcester MPD |
Three of Worcester's older engines have returned from works recently newly painted; they are Nos. 2051, 2458 an 3574. |
SLS/194711 |
30/09/1947 |
Welsh Border Branches |
Leominster-New Radnor & Presteign Branches: Normally 0-4-2T's Nos. 5808 o 5814 work the Presteign branch, the engine being shedded at Kington and provided by Hereford. On 27/9 No. 7420 was on the branch and during that week old 0-4-2T No. 3574 had been working from Worcester on the New Radnor branch, being shedded overnight at Leominster. The re-appearance of No. 3574 on this turn is of exceptional interest, as this loco. is one of the three remaining '517' Class 0-4-2T still in service; the class originally comprised some 165 engines, all of which were built at Wolverhampton Works between 1868 and 1896. Its re-appearance on a passenger train is accounted for by the fact that it had a heavy overhaul at Wolverhampton Works earlier this year, during which it was repainted green. |
SLS/194712 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3574 Built at Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road), Works Number 598 Diagram R3 boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1910 |
Modification |
Diagram R2/3 boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1916 |
Modification |
Diagram BR4 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1923 |
Modification |
Diagram R2/3 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1927 |
Modification |
Diagram BR4 boiler fitted |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (WOS) |
|
|
23/12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3574 |
|
|