Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 643 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14049 Week
» 67065 Month
» 186592 Year
» 3213445 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3579 |
25/09/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08464 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/09/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3579 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Preston (24K) |
|
|
18/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08464 |
|
|
01/09/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08464 from Swindon Works (ZL) |
|
|
03/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|