Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1578 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19381 Week
» 72397 Month
» 191924 Year
» 3218777 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3582 |
16/10/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08467 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/10/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/10/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3582 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
15/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
10/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08467 |
|
|
29/11/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08467 from Saltley (SY) |
|
|
01/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|