Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 74 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4931 Week
» 16636 Month
» 348125 Year
» 424712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3588 28/11/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08473 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 28/11/1958
Withdrawn 17/03/1986 off Crewe Diesel (CD)
Time in Service 27 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys
Cut Up 03/12/1993
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
26A Newton Heath (New) 28/11/1958
9A Longsight w/e 06/07/1968
NH Newton Heath w/e 12/05/1973
CD Crewe Diesel 2w/e 05/04/1975
   Withdrawn 17/03/1986

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/11/1958 To Service To service as D3588
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Newton Heath (26A)
   
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
12/05/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08473    
05/04/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
17/03/1986 Withdrawn Condemned as 08473 from Crewe Diesel (CD)    

prev prev