Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 98 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3715 Week
» 15420 Month
» 346909 Year
» 423496 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3591 17/12/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08476 06/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 17/12/1958
Withdrawn 09/09/1985 off Thornton Junction (TJ)
Time in Service 26 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
26A Newton Heath (New) 17/12/1958
9A Longsight w/e 06/07/1968
66A Polmadie w/e 27/11/1971
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972
67C Ayr 5w/e 30/12/1972
   Withdrawn 09/09/1985

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/12/1958 To Service To service as D3591
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Newton Heath (26A)
   
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
27/11/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
30/12/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
06/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08476    
09/09/1985 Withdrawn Condemned as 08476 from Thornton Junction (TJ)    

prev prev