Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 335 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18138 Week
» 71154 Month
» 190681 Year
» 3217534 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3595 |
12/09/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08480 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1977 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1979 |
|
Buckeye couplings fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/09/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
10/1977 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3595 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08480 |
|
|
10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
12/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Buckeye couplings fitted |
|
|