Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 94 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3711 Week
» 15416 Month
» 346905 Year
» 423492 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3596 19/09/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08481 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 19/09/1958
Withdrawn 31/08/2005
Time in Service 46 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83G Penzance (New) 19/09/1958
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 01/11/1958
88M Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 03/11/1962
87F Llanelly 4w/e 02/11/1963
87E Landore 3w/e 04/05/1964
87B Margam 7w/e 27/07/1968
86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 06/12/1969
   Withdrawn 31/08/2005

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/09/1958 To Service To service as D3596
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Penzance (83G)
   
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
27/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Margam (87B)    
06/12/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08481    
31/08/2005 Withdrawn Condemned as 08481    

prev prev