Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2622 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16028 Week
» 69044 Month
» 188571 Year
» 3215424 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3601 |
24/10/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08486 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/10/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/10/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3601 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08486 |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
27/11/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08486 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
18/04/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|