Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 25 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6240 Week
» 17945 Month
» 349434 Year
» 426021 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3605 14/11/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08490 05/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 14/11/1958
Withdrawn 18/12/1985 off Thornton Junction (TJ)
Time in Service 27 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
81A Old Oak Common (New) 14/11/1958
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 16/05/1959
88M Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 03/11/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 02/11/1963
87B Margam 6w/e 13/04/1964
87E Landore 9w/e 18/03/1968
81A Old Oak Common 6w/e 03/05/1969
   Stored 4w/e 24/01/1970
8J Allerton w/e 21/02/1970
8J Allerton w/e 07/03/1970
8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 28/03/1970
   Withdrawn 18/12/1985

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/11/1958 To Service To service as D3605
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A)
   
16/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Margam (87B)    
18/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
03/05/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
29/06/1969 Sightings Old Oak Common depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
24/01/1970 To Store To Store    
21/02/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
07/03/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
28/03/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
28/12/1971 Sightings Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot RO 517 Link
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08490    
18/12/1985 Withdrawn Condemned as 08490 from Thornton Junction (TJ)    

prev prev