Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1085 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14491 Week
» 67507 Month
» 187034 Year
» 3213887 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3606 |
19/11/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08491 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/11/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/11/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3606 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08491 |
|
|
29/09/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08491 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
10/04/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|