Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4379 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17785 Week
» 70801 Month
» 190328 Year
» 3217181 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3608 |
on |
02/02/1939 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
314 |
To Service |
Wed 02/02/1939 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 16/06/1965 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
81B |
Slough |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
ALLOC |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
4w/e |
29/09/1963 |
ALLOC |
81C |
Southall |
5w/e |
12/04/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/06/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
11/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/10/1962 |
Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works |
1628/60, 2841/62, 3217, 3608/58, 3709/15/51/60/78, 4147, 4910/51, 5070, 5245, 5602, 6141, 6644/63/79, 6816, 6982, 7209, 8498, 9411/53, 9608/10/5/40/82. Ex-Works on shed: 9404/15; ex-Works on Oxley MPD; 4697, 7739. 'Kings' at Stafford Road minus numbers and nameplates: 6001/2/7/12/4/5/7/22. |
SLS/196211 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/02/1939 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3608 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxford (OXF) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Slough (81B) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
28/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
16/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3608 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|