Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1722 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19525 Week
» 72541 Month
» 192068 Year
» 3218921 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3612 |
27/06/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/06/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
27/06/1958 |
Power Unit ER82466 |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
19/07/1962 |
24/08/1962 |
General |
|
|
|
37 days |
|
36,055 |
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
19/07/1962 |
24/08/1962 |
General |
|
|
|
37 days |
|
36,055 |
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
07/04/1964 |
27/04/1964 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
21 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
07/04/1964 |
27/04/1964 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
21 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/06/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3612 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
19/07/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1962. Dep: 24/08/1962. |
|
|
19/07/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1962. Dep: 24/08/1962. |
|
|
07/04/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/04/1964. Dep: 27/04/1964. |
|
|
07/04/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/04/1964. Dep: 27/04/1964. |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3612 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|