Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 21980 Month
» 217434 Year
» 1101815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3614 09/07/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 09/07/1958
Withdrawn 15/03/1969
Time in Service 10 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1969
Cut At Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New) 09/07/1958
40A Lincoln w/e 19/06/1965
   Withdrawn 15/03/1969

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
09/07/1958 Power Unit ER82542    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/07/1958 To Service To service as D3614
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
   
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
15/03/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D3614    
01/08/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co.: Chesterfield    

prev prev