Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 293 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18096 Week
» 71112 Month
» 190639 Year
» 3217492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3615 |
30/07/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/07/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/07/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3615 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
02/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J) |
|
|
29/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3615 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|