Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 379 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1764 Week
» 8569 Month
» 115515 Year
» 1337080 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3615 m/e 03/1939

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 03/1939
Withdrawal During 10/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 26 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 2w/e 17/11/1962
87D Swansea East Dock 3w/e 04/05/1964
88C Barry 7w/e 22/06/1964
87A Neath (Court Sart) 6w/e 12/10/1964
85A Worcester 2w/e 23/01/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 88C Barry 2w/e 17/11/1962
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 3w/e 04/05/1964
ALLOC 88C Barry 2w/e 16/05/1964
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 85A Worcester 2w/e 24/01/1965
WDN   01/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1939 To Service To service as GWR Number 3615
Built at Swindon Works
   
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
23/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 3615    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev