Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 21980 Month
» 217434 Year
» 1101815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3617 06/08/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 06/08/1958
Withdrawn 07/1969
Time in Service 10 yrs, 10 mths , 24 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1969
Cut At Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New) 06/08/1958
40A Lincoln w/e 19/06/1965
41J Shirebrook w/e 02/04/1966
34E New England w/e 29/10/1966
31B March w/e 26/10/1968
   Withdrawn 07/1969

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
06/08/1958 Power Unit ER82549    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/08/1958 To Service To service as D3617
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
   
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
02/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J)    
29/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
26/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D3617    
01/11/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co.: Chesterfield    

prev prev