Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 141 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 141 Week
» 21982 Month
» 217436 Year
» 1101817 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3618 21/08/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 21/08/1958
Withdrawn 19/04/1969
Time in Service 10 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1985
Cut At National Coal Board (Moor Green)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New) 21/08/1958
40A Lincoln w/e 19/06/1965
41J Shirebrook w/e 02/04/1966
41J Shirebrook 4w/e 31/10/1966
40B Immingham w/e 22/07/1967
40A Lincoln w/e 06/07/1968
   Withdrawn 19/04/1969

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
21/08/1958 Power Unit ER82785    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/08/1958 To Service To service as D3618
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
   
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
02/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J)    
31/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J)    
22/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
19/04/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D3618    
01/04/1985 Scrapped Broken up by National Coal Board: Moor Green    

prev prev