Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 861 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5435 Week
» 33393 Month
» 68035 Year
» 1289600 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3618 m/e 04/1939

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 04/1939
Withdrawal During 06/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964
Service Life 25 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHL Southall 4w/e 30/10/1948
81A Old Oak Common 5w/e 31/08/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC OXF Oxford 14/10/1948
ALLOC SHL Southall 4w/e 30/10/1948
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 5w/e 31/08/1963
WDN   w/e 15/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1939 To Service To service as GWR Number 3618
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (SHL)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 3618    

prev prev