Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 123 Today
» 843 Yesterday
» 2706 Week
» 19655 Month
» 133916 Year
» 1018297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3619 26/08/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 26/08/1958
Withdrawn 15/03/1969
Time in Service 10 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1985
Cut At National Coal Board (Moor Green)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New) 26/08/1958
40A Lincoln w/e 19/06/1965
   Withdrawn 15/03/1969

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
26/08/1958 Power Unit ER82662    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
26/08/1958 To Service To service as D3619
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
   
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
15/03/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D3619    
01/04/1985 Scrapped Broken up by National Coal Board: Moor Green    

prev prev