Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 100 Today
» 1187 Yesterday
» 2414 Week
» 13707 Month
» 278340 Year
» 1499905 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3619 m/e 04/1939

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 314
To Service During 04/1939
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/09/1966
Scrapping During 11/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 27 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1939
TYS Tyseley 4w/e 31/12/1949
84D Leamington 4w/e 30/09/1951
84G Kidderminster 4w/e 19/05/1962
2C Stourbridge Junction w/e 15/08/1964
2A Tyseley w/e 16/07/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 10/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CHR Chester West 4w/e 08/10/1949
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 84G Kidderminster 4w/e 19/05/1962
ALLOC 2C Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 05/09/1964
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 4w/e 06/08/1966
WDN   w/e 10/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1939 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 3619
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS)    
30/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (84G)    
15/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (2C)    
16/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 3619    

prev prev