Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 859 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5433 Week
» 33391 Month
» 68033 Year
» 1289598 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3620 m/e 05/1939

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 05/1939
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 26 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81A Old Oak Common 5w/e 24/08/1964
81C Southall 3w/e 28/03/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 10/08/1964
ALLOC 81C Southall 5w/e 12/04/1965
WDN   16/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1939 To Service To service as GWR Number 3620
Built at Swindon Works
   
24/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
28/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 3620    

prev prev