Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 124 Today
» 843 Yesterday
» 2707 Week
» 19656 Month
» 133917 Year
» 1018298 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3622 09/09/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 09/09/1958
Withdrawn 15/03/1969
Time in Service 10 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 01/07/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New) 09/09/1958
36A Doncaster 5w/e 15/11/1958
   Withdrawn 15/03/1969

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
09/09/1958 Power Unit ER85023    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/09/1958 To Service To service as D3622
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
   
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
15/03/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D3622    
01/07/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev