Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 208 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 2768 Week
» 15801 Month
» 238202 Year
» 1122583 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3623 11/09/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 11/09/1958
Withdrawn 15/03/1969
Time in Service 10 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys
Cut Up 01/07/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New) 11/09/1958
36A Doncaster 5w/e 15/11/1958
   Withdrawn 15/03/1969

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
11/09/1958 Power Unit ER82543    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
11/09/1958 To Service To service as D3623
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
   
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
15/03/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D3623    
01/07/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev