Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 739 Today
» 820 Yesterday
» 4142 Week
» 21091 Month
» 135352 Year
» 1019733 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3624 19/09/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 19/09/1958
Withdrawn 03/11/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys
Cut Up 01/07/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
40E Colwick (New) 19/09/1958
40B Immingham w/e 19/10/1963
40A Lincoln w/e 19/06/1965
   Withdrawn 03/11/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
19/09/1958 Power Unit ER85047    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/09/1958 To Service To service as D3624
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Colwick (40E)
   
19/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
03/11/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3624    
01/07/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev