Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1714 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19517 Week
» 72533 Month
» 192060 Year
» 3218913 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3628 |
on |
17/06/1939 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
314 |
To Service |
Mon 17/06/1939 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/01/1963 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 7 mths , 4 dys |
Total Mileage |
490,786 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
17/06/1939 |
PPRD |
|
Pontypool Road |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/01/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/01/1963 |
Wolverhampton Works (In Works) |
In Works: 1013/24, 1656/64, 2855, 3628(86G), 3788, 4136, 5244(86B), 6357(87C), 6692, 6975(87A), 7213, 7443, 7824, 8405/37/64, 8720, 9612/69, 9724. In Yard: 2257, 6915/6(89A), 9768. |
SLS/196302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/06/1939 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3628 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Pontypool Road (PPRD) |
|
|
21/01/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3628 |
|
|
03/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|