Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 785 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18588 Week
» 71604 Month
» 191131 Year
» 3217984 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3629 |
on |
24/06/1939 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
314 |
To Service |
Mon 24/06/1939 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/01/1963 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys |
Total Mileage |
527,819 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
4w/e |
17/06/1950 |
ALLOC |
83D |
Laira |
4w/e |
15/07/1950 |
ALLOC |
82D |
Westbury |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/06/1939 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3629 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Laira (LA) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
15/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (82D) |
|
|
14/01/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3629 |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|