Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3634 03/11/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 03/11/1958
Withdrawn 19/11/1971
Time in Service 13 yrs , 16 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1972
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 03/11/1958
31B March w/e 13/09/1969
36A Doncaster w/e 15/05/1971
   Withdrawn 19/11/1971

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
03/11/1958 Power Unit ER85081    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/11/1958 To Service To service as D3634
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
13/09/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
15/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
19/11/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D3634    
01/04/1972 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev