Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3115 Week
» 14686 Month
» 262979 Year
» 1147360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3637 13/11/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 13/11/1958
Withdrawn 12/11/1968
Time in Service 9 yrs, 11 mths , 30 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
40B Immingham (New) 13/11/1958
34A Kings Cross w/e 26/09/1959
36A Doncaster w/e 28/11/1959
   Withdrawn 12/11/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
13/11/1958 Power Unit ER85088    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/11/1958 To Service To service as D3637
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Immingham (40B)
   
26/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
12/11/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3637    
01/04/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    
15/06/1969 Sightings G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard RO 9/1969 Link

prev prev