Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 404 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2850 Week
» 14555 Month
» 346044 Year
» 422631 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3650   12/1939

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 12/1939
Withdrawal During 09/1963
Service Life 23 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 31/10/1953
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 26/12/1953
88E Abercynon 4w/e 05/11/1955
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 14/06/1958
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 04/11/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 88E Abercynon m/e 30/11/1955
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 04/11/1961
OFFSTOCK UNK   5w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1939 To Service To service as GWR Number 3650
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 3650    

prev prev