Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 801 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5402 Week
» 16949 Month
» 416631 Year
» 493218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3654 29/03/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08499 01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 29/03/1958
Withdrawn 01/06/2004
Time in Service 46 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
55B Stourton (New) 29/03/1958
55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 09/09/1967
YK York (North) w/e 13/05/1988
   Withdrawn 01/06/2004

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/03/1958 To Service To service as D3654
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Stourton (55B)
   
09/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08499    
13/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
01/06/2004 Withdrawn Condemned as 08499    

prev prev