Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1961 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15367 Week
» 68383 Month
» 187910 Year
» 3214763 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3656 |
29/04/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08501 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/04/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/04/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3656 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Stourton (55B) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
31/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (55C) |
|
|
03/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08501 |
|
|
30/08/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
15/07/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08501 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
11/08/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|