Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3657 06/05/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08502 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 06/05/1958
Withdrawn 30/10/1988 off Thornaby (TE)
Time in Service 30 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys
Status Awaiting Scrapping

Allocations
Code Name Date From
55B Stourton (New) 06/05/1958
55F Manningham 4w/e 19/07/1958
55H Neville Hill w/e 14/11/1964
51L Thornaby w/e 14/08/1971
   Withdrawn 30/10/1988


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/05/1958 To Service To service as D3657
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Stourton (55B)
   
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Manningham (55F)    
14/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H)    
14/08/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08502    
30/10/1988 Withdrawn Condemned as 08502 from Thornaby (TE)    

prev prev