Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 707 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2431 Week
» 12566 Month
» 328797 Year
» 839899 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3658 15/05/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08503 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 15/05/1958
Withdrawn 20/09/1988 off Holbeck (MR) (HO)
Time in Service 30 yrs, 4 mths , 5 dys
Status Awaiting Scrapping

Allocations
Code Name Date From
55B Stourton (New) 15/05/1958
55F Manningham 4w/e 19/07/1958
55C Farnley Junction w/e 31/10/1964
55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 03/12/1966
   Withdrawn 20/09/1988


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/05/1958 To Service To service as D3658
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Stourton (55B)
   
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Manningham (55F)    
31/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (55C)    
03/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08503    
20/09/1988 Withdrawn Condemned as 08503 from Holbeck (MR) (HO)    

prev prev