Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3659 24/05/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08504 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 24/05/1958
Withdrawn 30/10/1988 off Thornaby (TE)
Time in Service 30 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 23/09/1992
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 24/05/1958
41B Sheffield Darnall w/e 02/05/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
   Withdrawn 30/10/1988


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/05/1958 To Service To service as D3659
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08504    
30/10/1988 Withdrawn Condemned as 08504 from Thornaby (TE)    
23/09/1992 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev