Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2491 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15897 Week
» 68913 Month
» 188440 Year
» 3215293 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3659 |
on |
31/01/1940 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
325 |
To Service |
Fri 31/01/1940 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 01/10/1965 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 8 mths , 0 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/01/1940 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3659 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) |
|
|
14/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (OXF) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (SHL) |
|
|
23/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exeter (83C) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) |
|
|
19/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G) |
|
|
01/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3659 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|