Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 230 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 230 Week
» 30520 Month
» 333710 Year
» 1555275 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3660 31/05/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 08505 07/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0831/05/1958
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 31/05/1958 to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Withdrawn 22/02/1981 off Grangemouth (GM)
Time in Service 22 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys
Cut Up 26/03/1983
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) on 31/05/1958
41B Sheffield Darnall w/e 02/05/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill w/e 04/05/1968
60A Inverness 5w/e 30/11/1968
ED Eastfield 4w/e 29/03/1975
GM Grangemouth 4w/e 24/05/1975
   Withdrawn on 22/02/1981


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
31/05/1958 To Service To service as British Railways Number D3660
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
04/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/11/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
07/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08505 (Tops)    
29/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (ED)    
24/05/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (GM)    
22/02/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 08505 from GM Grangemouth    
22/02/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 08505 from Grangemouth (GM)    
26/03/1983 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev