Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 80 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 5227 Week
» 15397 Month
» 293193 Year
» 1177574 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3661 06/06/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08506 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 06/06/1958
Withdrawn 28/02/2007
Time in Service 48 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys
Cut Up 31/07/2007
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 06/06/1958
41B Sheffield Darnall w/e 02/05/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
34G Finsbury Park w/e 06/11/1965
34D Hitchin (GNR) w/e 11/12/1965
31B March w/e 28/12/1968
31A Cambridge w/e 25/10/1969
DN Darlington w/e 15/08/1976
   Withdrawn 28/02/2007


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/06/1958 To Service To service as D3661
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
11/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D)    
28/12/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
25/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08506    
15/08/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DN)    
28/02/2007 Withdrawn Condemned as 08506    
31/07/2007 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev