Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 404 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18207 Week
» 71223 Month
» 190750 Year
» 3217603 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3662 |
20/06/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08507 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/02/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/02/1977 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/06/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
05/02/1977 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/06/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3662 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
16/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08507 |
|
|
05/02/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/02/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
13/08/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08507 from Reading (W.R.) (RG) |
|
|