Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 863 Today
» 879 Yesterday
» 1742 Week
» 10484 Month
» 354663 Year
» 865765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3665 02/02/1959
TOPS (Tops) 09001 28/01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 09
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 02/02/1959
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
71A Eastleigh (New) 02/02/1959
73C Hither Green 4w/e 24/09/1962
73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon 3w/e 10/01/1966
73C Hither Green 4w/e 09/07/1967
SU Selhurst 4w/e 28/01/1974

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
02/02/1959 Power Unit IH4310    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
02/02/1959 To Service To service as D3665
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Eastleigh (71A)
   
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
10/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
09/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
27/10/1968 Sightings Hither Green depot: On shed RO 12/1968 Link
03/1971 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
09/01/1972 Sightings Swindon Works visit: In "A" shop RO 3/1972 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 09001    
28/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Selhurst (SU)    

prev